FL S1236 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exception to a prohibition on possessing firearms or other specified devices on school property or other specified areas for authorized concealed weapon or firearm licensees who are designated by school principals or district school superintendents; requiring district school boards to formulate and prescribe policies and procedures for active shooter and hostage situations; requiring a district school superintendent to provide specified agencies with certain strategy and activity recommendations to improve school safety and security, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/20/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Judiciary; Education; Rules
2017-12-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H621 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
S7026 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Chapter No. 2018-3
H7101 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback