FL S1234 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Campus Free Expression Act"; authorizing a public institution of higher education to create and enforce certain restrictions relating to expressive activities on campus; providing for a cause of action against a public institution of higher education for violations of the act; requiring student government associations to provide specified information to recognized student organizations that request funding, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Free Expression on Campus

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/20/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-02-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-07SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 4
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Education; Judiciary
2017-12-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H909 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H423 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 4
S4 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-4

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004097Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100924Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/101332/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/108472/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/492402/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/215150/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/301064/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/725138/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/520604/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/838782/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/704918/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1234/Amendment/534074/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback