FL S1232 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the maximum reward paid to persons providing certain information leading to the recovery of certain fraudulent public assistance payments; directing state-retained shares of recovered public assistance overpayments to be held in the Federal Grants Trust Fund, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Assistance Fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-01SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-28SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/28/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-23SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-22SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-12-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H643 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41439Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback