FL S1232 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9027 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9027 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 2, 2014, as "Dentists' Day on the Hill", etc.
Title
Dentists' Day on the Hill
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9027 (Adopted) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H9027 (Similar To) 2014-04-02 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1232 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1232 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1232/BillText/Filed/HTML |