FL S1232 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies a period during which sales of firearms are exempt from the tax. Authorizes the Department of Revenue to adopt rules.
Title
Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions/Firearms
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Norman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 92 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 92 | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0461 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1232 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1232/BillText/Filed/HTML |