FL S1232 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes an insurer offering a group or individual health benefit plan to offer a wellness program. Authorizes appeals from denials of certain claims for certain services. Requires the health insurer to submit a written justification for a determination that a service was not medically necessary. Requiring a HMO to conduct a retrospective review of the medical necessity of a service under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Commerce
2010-04-16 Now in Commerce -SJ 00599
2010-04-15 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-13 CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00606
2010-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/13/10, 12:30 pm, 412-K
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce; Health Regulation; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00089
2010-02-03 Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce; Health Regulation; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0715 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died pending review of CS
H1143 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H1503 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
06269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
06276141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
06413156Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback