FL S1230 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to a prohibition on public employee COVID-19 vaccination mandates, a prohibition on private employer COVID-19 vaccination mandates, a public records exemption for complaints and investigations regarding private employer COVID-19 vaccination mandates, and a prohibition on COVID-19 vaccination mandates for students, respectively; deleting a prohibition on certain facial covering and quarantine mandates in K-12 schools; deleting a related right of action for parents and certain students, etc.
Title
COVID-19 Mandates
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 0441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1230 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1230/BillText/Filed/HTML |