FL S1230 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that judgments of guilty or not guilty of petit theft be in a written record or an electronic record with the judge's electronic signature, recorded by the clerk of the circuit court; requiring that for an electronic judgment of guilty, the fingerprints of a defendant be electronically captured and a certain certification be included; requiring that specified judgments of guilty be in a written record or an electronic record with the judge's electronic signature, recorded by the clerk of the circuit court, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Judgments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-14SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-07SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-12-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1401 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921242Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback