FL S1222 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating a probationary split sentence for substance use and mental health offenders in accordance with s. 948.012, F.S.; authorizing the sentencing court to have the Department of Corrections conduct a presentence investigation report in accordance with s. 921.231, F.S., for the purpose of providing the court with appropriate information to determine the type of probation most appropriate for the offender; requiring written notification from the department to the specified parties if an offender is terminated from or prevented from entering the in-prison treatment program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-02-08SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-02-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1409 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
397755Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9480121Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback