FL S1220 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that a custodial interrogation at a place of detention be electronically recorded in its entirety in connection with certain offenses; requiring law enforcement officers who do not comply with the electronic recording requirement or who conduct custodial interrogations at a place other than a place of detention to prepare a specified report; providing immunity from civil liability to law enforcement agencies that enforce certain rules; prohibiting introduction into or possession of, on the grounds of any county detention facility, any cellular telephone or other portable communication device, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Detention Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-26SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-02-23SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/20/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H929 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H733 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1886 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
90005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95122Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback