FL S1218 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that certain taxes of a specified amount be transferred annually to the Grants and Donations Trust Fund within the Department of Children and Families for the purpose of funding challenge grants; increasing the number of members on the Council on Homelessness to include a representative of the Florida Housing Coalition and the Secretary of the Department of Elder Affairs or his or her designee; revising the duties of the State Office on Homelessness, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homelessness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-02SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-27SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-25SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Not Considered
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1353 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4206225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4206227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420623Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420624Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420626Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4206265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4206275Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback