FL S1218 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Florida Correctional Operations Oversight Council within the Office of Chief Inspector General; authorizing a mutual aid agreement in the event of a declared state of emergency for certain law enforcement purposes; requiring each judicial circuit to establish a Driver License Reinstatement Days program for reinstating suspended driver licenses in certain circumstances; authorizing a court to impose a sentence other than a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment and mandatory fine for a person convicted of trafficking if the court makes certain findings on the record, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time 723
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 13 NAYS 5
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-23SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/21/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-30SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S484 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H481 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H491 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-49
H547 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-92
H713 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1169 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H1201 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-104
H7071 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H7089 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S226 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S238 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S602 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S694 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S776 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 491
S928 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1208 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1318 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1201
S1678 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 547
S1396 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7061
S1392 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-127

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1432Amended CodeSee Bill Text
210095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
231225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7840485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7940115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
903046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
907042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9070421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
907043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
932701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
932703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943687Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9448055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9448065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947149Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948081Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback