FL S1214 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from public records requirements a form, application, record, interview, report, physician's statement, memorandum, or drug test result, relating to the medical use of cannabis, held by the Department of Health, the Department of Business and Professional Regulation, or the Department of Revenue; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Medical Use of Cannabis/DOH/DBPR/DOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1250 (Related) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H1139 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H1139 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1214 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1214/BillText/Filed/HTML |