FL S1214 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an investment firm that does business with the State Board of Administration from employing or entering into a similar contractual relationship with a former employee of the board under certain circumstances; authorizing the executive director of the board to waive the postemployment restriction under certain circumstances; subjecting an investment firm to a penalty for violations of the postemployment restriction; requiring that the board provide to the office of the Chief Financial Officer the identity of certain former employees and the dates of their termination of employment with the board, etc.
Title
State Board of Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2012-01-17 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2012-01-17 | Original reference(s)- removed: Banking and Insurance -SJ 213 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 98 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 98 | |
2011-12-08 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1214 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1214/BillText/Filed/HTML |