FL S1210 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "communications services" to exclude Internet video service; prohibiting, except for specified exceptions, public bodies from levying on or collecting from sellers or purchasers of Internet video services any tax, charge, fee, or other imposition on or with respect to the provision or purchase of Internet video services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation of Internet Video Service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1245 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
610118Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback