FL S1210 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a juvenile civil citation program be established at the local level with the concurrence of the chief judge of the circuit and other designated persons. Requires a law enforcement officer, upon making contact with a juvenile, to issue a civil citation if the juvenile admits to having committed a misdemeanor and he or she is not a danger to himself or herself or another, etc.
Title
Juvenile Civil Citations [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Criminal Justice | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00087 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2010-01-14 | Filed |