FL S1208 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the council within the Office of Chief Inspector General; specifying the purpose of the council; providing terms of office and requirements regarding the council's membership; prohibiting the council from interfering with the operations of the Department of Corrections or the Department of Juvenile Justice; establishing certain restrictions applicable to members of the council and council staff, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Correctional Operations Oversight Council

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-23SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1169 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1432Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback