FL S1208 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the length of time for distribution and reducing the percentage of annual use fees received from the sale of Florida Salutes Veterans license plates which is distributed to a specific direct-support organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates/Florida Salutes Veterans [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168)
2010-04-15 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00599
2010-04-14 CS by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00606
2010-04-09 Now in Military Affairs and Domestic Security -SJ 00524; On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 04/14/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S
2010-04-08 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2010-04-07 Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Transportation (325748); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation; Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00087
2010-01-20 Referred to Transportation; Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Rules
2010-01-14 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0351 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-168
S0736 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001; Substituted CS/CS/HB 351 -SJ 01001; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168) -SJ 01001

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
032008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback