FL S1206 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Corrections to extend the limits of confinement to allow an inmate that may not otherwise qualify for work release to be released on electronic monitoring; requiring the department to administer a risk assessment tool to determine an inmate's appropriateness for release on electronic monitoring; authorizing a law enforcement or a probation officer to arrest such an inmate without warrant in accordance with specified authority, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Inmates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-23SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H885 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S484 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
945091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94833Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback