FL S1204 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for a law clerk for each circuit court judge; specifying a base salary, etc.
Title
Law Clerks for Circuit Court Judges
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H617 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1204 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1204/BillText/Filed/HTML |