FL S1204 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability, the Joint Administrative Procedures Committee, the Legislative Committee on Intergovernmental Relations, the Joint Legislative Committee on Everglades Oversight, and the Florida Government Accountability Act. Repeals provisions relating to creation of a joint select committee to review the findings and recommendations of the Century Commission for a Sustainable Florida for potential action, etc.
Title
Joint Legislative Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 96 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 234 | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time -HJ 202 | |
2011-03-09 | Substituted for HB 7017 -HJ 179 | |
2011-03-08 | In Messages | |
2011-03-08 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/11 | |
2011-02-24 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1000 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 919 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 920 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3247 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 0446 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 163 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 0943 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 7001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 0085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 0614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 45926 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
590 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |