FL S1204 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Redefines the term "special risk member." Revises criteria for membership in the special risk class to include members employed by public acute care hospitals serving certain patients. Provided legislative findings that the act fulfills an important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Retirement System [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Community Affairs
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Health Regulation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00087
2010-01-20 Referred to Community Affairs; Health Regulation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-01-14 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0127 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S1996 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
H1315 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0121021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01210515Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback