FL S1202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for business e-mail addresses of current justices and judges; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/E-mail Addresses of Current Justices and Judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H507 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1202 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1202/BillText/Filed/HTML |