FL S1200 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adding an alternative transportation authority as part of the operations of the Department of Transportation; requiring the responsibility for expending certain funds to be delegated by the department secretary to the executive director of the authority, subject to certain requirements; beginning in a specified timeframe, revising annual allocations in the State Transportation Trust Fund for the Transportation Regional Incentive Program; repealing provisions relating to fund participation and the Florida Rail Enterprise, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Alternative Transportation Authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H535 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S852 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34186Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34358Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback