FL S1198 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Florida Virtual School to give enrollment priority to dependent children of certain active duty military personnel; requiring that certain examinations and assessments be available to all Florida Virtual School students; requiring that dependent children of active duty military personnel be given first preference for admission to the Florida Virtual School, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virtual Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2017-12-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H949 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
H699 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
S1090 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H29 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 2018-7
S1884 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 29
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101232Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback