FL S1184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a Closing the Gap grant proposal to address racial and ethnic disparities in morbidity and mortality rates relating to Lupus, etc.
Title
Closing the Gap Grant Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 1009 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted HB 1009 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1009 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-157
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1184 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1184/BillText/Filed/HTML |