FL S1184 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Adopted as amended, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 1001 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Adopted as amended, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 1001 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Condemning the Boycott, Divestment and Sanctions movement and the increasing incidence of acts of anti-Semitism, etc.
Title
Anti-Israel Boycott, Divestment, and Sanctions Campaigns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | Adopted as amended, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 1001 (Adopted) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (399860) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/16 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1001 (Similar To) 2016-03-02 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1184 (Adopted)