FL S1176 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the requirement that a hospice physician, nurse, or social worker obtain the permission of a family member or a caregiver of the deceased patient to assist in the disposal of an unused controlled substance prescribed to the patient, etc.
Title
Disposal of Prescribed Controlled Substances by a Hospice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Rules |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1176 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1176/BillText/Filed/HTML |