FL S1174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to marriages between persons of the same sex; removing a prohibition on the recognition of marriages entered into between persons of the same sex in this state, another state, or another jurisdiction, either domestic or foreign, etc.
Title
Marriage Equality
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1638 (Similar To) 2017-03-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H6041 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
H6041 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1174 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1174/BillText/Filed/HTML |