FL S1170 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing local governmental units to contract for certain group insurance with a corporation not for profit whose membership consists of specified local governmental units; deleting a provision authorizing group insurance plans to impose a certain preexisting condition exclusion; requiring a health maintenance organization that issues a health insurance contract, rather than a group health insurance contract, to renew or continue in force such coverage at the contract holder's option, etc.
Title
Health Plan Regulatory Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#807 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#46 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#46 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Chapter No. 2016-194 | |
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 951 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0951 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1170 (Ch. 2016-194)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 642 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6486 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64871 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6488 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6498 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6561 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6562 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6741 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |