FL S1168 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that personal lines residential and commercial residential property insurance policies may not restrict the assignment of post-loss benefits; prohibiting specified acts by insurers relating to certain losses under homeowners' insurance policies; providing that an agreement to assign post-loss benefits of a residential homeowner's property insurance is not valid unless specified conditions are met, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-07SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-01-26SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-23SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2017-12-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7015 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S62 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S256 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S258 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277152Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/Amendment/178904/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/Amendment/382922/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/Amendment/202936/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/Amendment/313360/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/Amendment/606060/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/Amendment/804018/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/Amendment/422902/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1168/Amendment/960354/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback