FL S1168 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring approval by referendum for the issuance of certain municipal bonds; providing ballot requirements for certain municipal bond referenda, etc.
Title
Municipal Bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0435 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1168 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1168/BillText/Filed/HTML |