FL S1168 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for a mobile home park owner to increase the lot rental of the purchaser of a mobile home on a leased lot in the mobile home park; providing limitations on the amount of rent increase; providing guidelines for determining the amount of the adjustment; limiting the amount of lot rental increase on a lot that was previously subject to a lifetime lease, etc.
Title
Mobile Home Park Lot Tenancies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1168 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1168/BillText/Filed/HTML |