FL S1162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Northwest Florida Rural Inland Affected Counties Recovery Fund within the Department of Economic Opportunity; requiring certain payments to be appropriated annually to the fund; requiring the department to grant awards to organizations and local governments for specified infrastructure projects and workforce programs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Northwest Florida Rural Inland Affected Counties Recovery Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-03-18SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H191 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2888055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback