FL S1160 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing changes to public assistance policy and federal food assistance waivers to conform to federal law and simplify administration unless such changes increase income or resource eligibility standards for the program; requiring the Department of Children and Families to impose a resource limit for households receiving food assistance, subject to federal approval; requiring the department to implement asset verification to verify eligibility for public assistance, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Self-sufficiency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H693 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S508 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445004Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback