FL S1156 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2023-316)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing employers to establish post-employment volunteer programs to allow retirees to provide certain services during a specified timeframe; requiring such programs to meet specified criteria, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Retirement System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-28SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2023-316)
2023-04-28SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1121
2023-04-28SenateRead 2nd time
2023-04-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
2023-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-04-25SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2023-04-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2023-03-24SenateNow in Appropriations
2023-03-24SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations
2023-03-24SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Community Affairs; Rules
2023-03-23SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2023-03-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-03-22SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-03-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-03-02SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
2023-02-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1121 (Same As) 2023-07-05 - Chapter No. 2023-316

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121091Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/Amendment/248624/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/Analyses/2023s01156.pre.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/Analyses/2023s01156.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/Analyses/2023s01156.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/Analyses/2023s01156.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/Vote/2023-03-22%201100AM~S01156%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1156/Vote/2023-04-25%201000AM~S01156%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback