FL S1156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the imposing of a sentence of death upon a defendant convicted of a capital felony if the defendant had a serious mental illness at the time of committing the offense; requiring a defendant to provide a certain notice if he or she intends to raise serious mental illness as a bar to a death sentence; requiring the defendant to file a written motion if he or she intends to raise serious mental illness as a bar to a death sentence; requiring certain court orders if the court finds by clear and convincing evidence that the defendant had a serious mental illness at the time of the commission of the crime, etc.
Title
Serious Mental Illness as Bar to Execution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |