FL S1154 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a labor pool satisfies certain requirements if its facilities meet the minimum requirements in the Florida Building Code and any local amendments thereto; authorizing labor pools to provide drinking water through certain alternative means; requiring an aggrieved worker to provide specified notice to a labor pool before bringing a civil action; authorizing a labor pool to cure alleged violations in a specified manner, etc.
Title
Labor Pool Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#420 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Chapter No. 2023-138 | |
2023-05-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-03 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-05-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023) |
2023-05-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H895 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1154 (Ch. 2023-138)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
448 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |