FL S1148 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 971
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising definitions relating to the Florida Uniform Traffic Control Law; authorizing a county or municipality to enact an ordinance regulating the operation of electric bicycles on sidewalks or sidewalk areas when such use is permissible under federal law; expanding exceptions to a prohibition on persons driving certain vehicles on sidewalks and bicycle paths; requiring electric bicycles to comply with specified provisions of law, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Bicycles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 971
2020-03-09SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 971
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-05SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
2020-02-11SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-10SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-02-05SenateNow in Community Affairs
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-12-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H971 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-69

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31620655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403717Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
681102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback