FL S1138 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/CS/HB 399 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 399 (Ch. 2010-86) -SJ 00593
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/CS/HB 399 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 399 (Ch. 2010-86) -SJ 00593
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the application form for motor vehicle registration or renewal of registration to include language permitting the applicant to make a voluntary contribution to Blind Babies and Blind Youth Services, for services for persons with developmental disabilities, and to the Ronald McDonald House. Provides for distribution of funds collected from voluntary contributions, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles [CPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/CS/HB 399 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 399 (Ch. 2010-86) -SJ 00593 | |
2010-04-09 | Original reference(s) removed: Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS/CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00539 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-08 | Original reference(s) removed: Higher Education Appropriations; Remaining references corrected to Education Pre-K - 12; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00249; Now in Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2010-03-04 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-03 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00190; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00242 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation; Education Pre-K - 12; Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 00081; On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/03/10, 3:15 pm, 37-S | |
2010-02-26 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/03/10, 3:15 pm, 37-S | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Transportation; Education Pre-K - 12; Higher Education Appropriations | |
2010-01-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0399 (Similar To) 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-86
S2652 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 399 (Ch. 2010-86)
S2652 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 399 (Ch. 2010-86)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |