FL S1134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying the jurisdictions under which certain prohibited acts relating to electronic monitoring devices may be prosecuted, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Monitoring Devices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-25SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H569 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
84323Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback