FL S1134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6049
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising a requirement that the department license one applicant who is a member of a certain class to exclude a requirement that the applicant also be a member of the Black Farmers and Agriculturalist Association-Florida Chapter, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health Responsibilities Related to the Medical Use of Marijuana

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 6049
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted HB 6049
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-01SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-07SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-05SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-31SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-23SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/24/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2017-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6049 (Same As) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-142

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback