FL S1134 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to remove restrictions on the purchase of personal firearms by qualified law enforcement officers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purchase of Personal Firearms by Qualified Law Enforcement Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2016-01-05SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2015-12-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1132 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1395 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback