FL S1134 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting allopathic, osteopathic, and chiropractic physicians who sell or rent electrostimulation medical equipment and supplies to their patients in the course of their practice from licensure as home medical equipment providers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Medical Equipment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Appropriations
2014-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2014-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2014-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2014-04-01SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2014-03-31SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2014-03-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2014-03-25SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2014-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2014-02-26SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2014-02-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1195 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback