FL S1130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding an existing public records exemption by redefining the term "active" to include an ongoing, good faith reinvestigation that previously resulted in the conviction of the accused person; providing for future review and repeal of the expanded exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Criminal Investigative Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback