FL S1128 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Preempting the regulation of vacation rentals to the state; prohibiting a local law, ordinance, or regulation from allowing or requiring inspections or licensing of public lodging establishments, including vacation rentals, or public food service establishments; requiring licenses issued by the Division of Hotels and Restaurants of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to be displayed conspicuously to the public inside the licensed establishment, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation Rentals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-02-18SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-12SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2020-01-13SenateFavorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2019-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1011 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
509013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509243Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback