FL S1126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the reimbursement of per diem and travel expenses to members of the pediatric cardiac technical advisory panel, established within the Agency for Health Care Administration; providing immunity from civil and criminal liabilities to members of the panel; requiring the Secretary of Health Care Administration to consult the panel for advisory recommendations on certain certificate of need applications, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pediatric Cardiac Technical Advisory Panel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-11SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-11SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1207 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback