FL S1126 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from licensure under part III of ch. 560, F.S., for persons authorized by the Office of Financial Regulation to cash, subject to certain limitations, certain payment instruments within a specified aggregate face value range; requiring the office to authorize the person to cash such instruments without such licensure if specified conditions are met, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure of Check Cashers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-02-08SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Rules
2017-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1311 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
560304Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback