FL S1114 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a person to seek a declaratory statement from an agency as to the effect of the person's criminal background on his or her eligibility for certain licenses, registrations, or certificates; deleting the requirement for a yacht broker to maintain a separate license for each branch office; prohibiting the conviction of a crime before a specified date from being grounds for the denial of certain licenses; revising licensure requirements for asbestos abatement consulting or contracting as a partnership, corporation, business trust, or other legal entity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules
2018-02-07SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2018-01-24SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1041 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
H15 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
S526 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1318 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1201

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
120565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
326004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
469009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481229Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481329Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548017Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback