FL S1110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the Florida-China Institute from the list of authorized Florida linkage institutes; prohibiting the creation or funding of linkage institutes based on agreements between the Board of Governors or the State Board of Education and a counterpart organization in a country governed by a communist regime; requiring the Board of Governors and the State Board of Education to withdraw from such agreements by a specified date; prohibiting certain postsecondary institutions from entering into specified agreements with a communist regime, or an entity that is organized and exists under the laws of a country governed by a communist regime, etc.
Title
Relations Between Postsecondary Institutions and Communist Regimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1047 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 8175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1110 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1110/BillText/Filed/HTML |